House
|
05/10/2021
|
File Number 675
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 415
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 7999
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Bill Passed Temporarily
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
File Number 151
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
House Calendar Number 140
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/02
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Drafted by Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Vote to Draft
|
|
|