Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06229 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 10, 2021
Fiscal Note May 6, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill January 28, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis May 10, 2021
Analysis May 8, 2021
Bill April 14, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021