Connecticut 2021 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06229 Comm Sub / Analysis

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
Researcher: JC 	Page 1 	3/29/21 
 
 
 
OLR Bill Analysis 
sHB 6229  
 
AN ACT ADDRESSING THE NEEDS OF FOOD	-INSECURE 
STUDENTS AT PUBLIC INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION.  
 
SUMMARY 
This bill makes a number of changes designed to assess and address 
food insecurity for the state’s public college and university students. It 
defines “food insecurity” or “food insecure” as the lack of financial 
resources needed to consistently access enough food for an active and 
healthy life. 
Specifically, the bill requires public colleges and universities to do 
the following: 
1. starting by March 1, 2022, biennially administer a survey to 
enrolled students to collect data on student food insecurity and 
the causes and reasons for it; 
2. starting by October 1, 2022, biennially evaluate their services 
and programs addressing the needs of food-insecure students 
and, based on the survey results, establish new services and 
programs, or amend existing ones, to address these students’ 
needs;  
3. starting by January 1, 2023, biennially report to the Higher 
Education Committee on the (a) survey results; (b) food 
insecurity services and programs offered, including any 
changes made based on the survey results; and (c) number of 
students who used the services and programs in the preceding 
two years; and 
4. notify specified students about their potential eligibility for 
Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP) benefits.  2021HB-06229-R000151-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 2 	3/29/21 
 
The bill requires the Board of Regents for Higher Education (BOR) 
and UConn Board of Trustees (BOT) to consult with the Department of 
Social Services (DSS) to identify and maximize the number of work-
study programs they offer that qualify as an employment and training 
program for purposes of SNAP.  
Lastly, the bill requires DSS, when determining SNAP eligibility, to 
consider a state public college or university student to be participating 
in a federal work-study program as soon as the student is approved for 
the program as part of a financial aid package to attend the college or 
university, regardless of whether the student has received his or her 
work study program assignment yet. Under federal law, a student 
who is actively participating in a state or federally funded work-study 
program is eligible to receive SNAP benefits. Special eligibility rules 
apply during the COVID-19 public health emergency for students who 
are eligible to participate in work study (see BACKGROUND).   
EFFECTIVE DATE:  July 1, 2021 
§ 1 — FOOD INSECURITY SURV EY 
Under the bill, the survey administered by each public college and 
university must include questions about a student’s (1) demographic 
background, including age, race, ethnicity, gender identity, marital 
status, income, education, and employment; (2) specific barriers to 
food access; and (3) awareness or use of community or institutional 
resources to address food insecurity and barriers to accessing these 
resources. 
§ 2 — PROGRAMS AND SERVICE S ADDRESSING FOOD 
INSECURITY 
Under the bill, the services or programs that public colleges and 
universities establish or modify to address student food insecurity may 
include the following: 
1. assistance and support for students to enroll in SNAP or any 
other state or federal nutrition assistance or financial aid 
program, including programs for families, if applicable;  2021HB-06229-R000151-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 3 	3/29/21 
 
2. providing low-cost food or meal plan options on campus; 
3. allowing students additional meals through extra card swipes 
on meal plans; 
4. providing financial assistance or other financial student aid; 
5. establishing or expanding on-campus food pantries; and  
6. starting a fruit and vegetable incentive program or similar 
program for students through an agreement with a local 
nonprofit or government agency. 
The bill requires services and programs amended or established 
based on survey results to serve to at least 10% of the students 
identified in the survey as being food insecure. 
§§ 3 & 4 — SNAP ELIGIBILITY FOR PUBLIC COLLEGE AND 
UNIVERSITY STUDENTS 
By January 1, 2022, the bill requires BOR and BOT to consult with 
DSS to (1) identify any of their offered educational programs that 
would increase a student’s employability and qualify as an 
employment and training program under SNAP student eligibility 
requirements (see BACKGROUND) and (2) maximize the number and 
types of these programs offered. BOR, BOT, and DSS must also post 
and regularly update the list of these qualified programs offered at 
each institution under their governance on their website. The bill 
allows any of the state’s public colleges and universities to consult 
with DSS to identify these programs. 
The bill requires each public higher education institution to notify 
students identified by the institution’s financial aid office as being 
potentially eligible for SNAP and include in the notification (1) 
program eligibility requirements, (2) the program application process, 
and (3) information on assistance in completing the program 
application. 
BACKGROUND 
SNAP Student Eligibility   2021HB-06229-R000151-BA.DOCX 
 
Researcher: JC 	Page 4 	3/29/21 
 
Students enrolled at least half-time at a higher education institution 
are generally ineligible for SNAP unless they qualify for an exemption. 
These exemptions include participating in a (1) state or federally 
financed work study program and (2) SNAP employment and training 
program or other eligible program.  
The federal Consolidated Appropriations Act 2021 temporarily 
extends SNAP eligibility to students enrolled at least half-time at a 
higher education institution who either (1) are eligible to participate in 
a state or federally funded work-study program during the academic 
year or (2) have an expected family contribution of zero in the 
academic year, and meet all other SNAP eligibility criteria. This benefit 
extension will remain in effect until 30 days after the COVID-19 public 
health emergency ends.  
COMMITTEE ACTION 
Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee 
Joint Favorable Substitute 
Yea 18 Nay 4 (03/11/2021)