Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06229 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-LCO \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-R03-
3+LCO \\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-R02-
44 HB.docx
55 1 of 4
66
77 General Assembly Substitute Bill No. 6229
88 January Session, 2021
99
1010
1111
1212
1313
1414 AN ACT ADDRESSING TH E NEEDS OF FOOD-INSECURE STUDENTS
1515 AT PUBLIC INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION.
1616 Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General
1717 Assembly convened:
1818
1919 Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section, 1
2020 "food insecurity" or "food insecure" means the lack of financial resources 2
2121 needed to consistently access enough food for an active and healthy life. 3
2222 (b) Not later than March 1, 2022, and biennially thereafter, each public 4
2323 institution of higher education in the state shall administer a survey to 5
2424 each student enrolled at such institution for the purpose of collecting 6
2525 data on the number of students who are food insecure and the causes of 7
2626 and reasons for such food insecurity. Such survey shall include, but 8
2727 need not be limited to, questions regarding a student's (1) demographic 9
2828 background, including age, race, ethnicity, gender identity, marital 10
2929 status, income, education and employment; (2) specific barriers to food 11
3030 access; and (3) awareness or use of community or institutional resources 12
3131 to address food insecurity and any barriers to accessing such resources. 13
3232 (c) Not later than October 1, 2022, and biennially thereafter, each 14
3333 public institution of higher education shall evaluate any services and 15
3434 programs offered by such institution to address the needs of food-16
3535 insecure students. Based on the results of the survey administered 17
3636 pursuant to subsection (b) of this section, each institution shall amend 18 Substitute Bill No. 6229
3737
3838
3939 LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-
40-R03-HB.docx }
40+R02-HB.docx }
4141 2 of 4
4242
4343 any existing or establish new services and programs to address the 19
4444 needs of food-insecure students. Such services or programs may 20
4545 include, but not be limited to, (1) assistance and support for students to 21
4646 enroll in the supplemental nutrition assistance program pursuant to the 22
4747 federal Food and Nutrition Act of 2008 or any other state or federal 23
4848 program for nutrition assistance or financial aid, including programs for 24
4949 families, if applicable to the student; (2) providing low-cost food or meal 25
5050 plan options on campus; (3) allowing students additional meals through 26
5151 extra card swipes on meal plans; (4) providing financial assistance or 27
5252 other financial student aid; (5) establishing or expanding a food pantry 28
5353 on campus; or (6) initiating a fruit and vegetable incentive program, or 29
5454 making such program available to students through agreement with a 30
5555 community nonprofit organization or governmental agency that 31
5656 provides such program. When amending or establishing any services or 32
5757 programs pursuant to this subsection, each institution shall have the 33
5858 goal of providing such services and programs to not less than ten per 34
5959 cent of the number of students identified as being food insecure in the 35
6060 survey administered pursuant to subsection (b) of this section. 36
6161 (d) Not later than January 1, 2023, and biennially thereafter, each 37
6262 public institution of higher education in the state shall submit a report, 38
6363 in accordance with the provisions of section 11-4a of the general statutes, 39
6464 to the joint standing committee of the General Assembly having 40
6565 cognizance of matters relating to higher education, regarding any food 41
6666 insecurities among the students at such institution, including, but not 42
6767 limited to, (1) results from the survey administered pursuant to 43
6868 subsection (b) of this section, (2) services and programs to address the 44
6969 needs of food insecure students, including any amendments made to 45
7070 such services or programs pursuant to subsection (c) of this section, and 46
7171 (3) the number of students who utilized such services and programs 47
7272 during the preceding two years. 48
7373 Sec. 2. Section 17b-105f of the general statutes is amended by adding 49
7474 subsections (e) and (f) as follows (Effective July 1, 2021): 50
7575 (NEW) (e) (1) Not later than January 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, 51 Substitute Bill No. 6229
7676
7777
7878 LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-
79-R03-HB.docx }
79+R02-HB.docx }
8080 3 of 4
8181
8282 the Board of Regents for Higher Education and the Board of Trustees of 52
8383 The University of Connecticut shall consult with the Department of 53
8484 Social Services for the purpose of identifying any educational program 54
8585 offered at an institution of higher education governed by said boards 55
8686 that qualifies as an employment and training program which increases 56
8787 a student's employability and complies with the requirements for an 57
8888 exemption, as specified in 7 CFR 273.5(b)(11), as amended from time to 58
8989 time, from the supplemental nutrition assistance program eligibility 59
9090 rule in 7 CFR 273.5(a), as amended from time to time. In identifying such 60
9191 educational programs, the department and said boards shall seek to 61
9292 maximize the number and types of employment and training programs 62
9393 offered at the institution of higher education governed by said boards. 63
9494 (2) Any independent institution of higher education in the state may, 64
9595 in such institution's discretion, consult with the Department of Social 65
9696 Services for the purposes set forth in subdivision (1) of this subsection. 66
9797 (NEW) (f) Not later than July 1, 2022, the Department of Social 67
9898 Services, the Board of Regents for Higher Education and the Board of 68
9999 Trustees of The University of Connecticut shall each post, and regularly 69
100100 update, on their Internet web site, the list of educational programs 70
101101 offered at each institution of higher education governed by said boards 71
102102 that has been qualified as an employment and training program 72
103103 pursuant to subdivision (1) of subsection (e) of this section. 73
104104 Sec. 3. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) For the purpose of determining 74
105105 eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program pursuant 75
106106 to the federal Food and Nutrition Act of 2008, as amended from time to 76
107107 time, the Department of Social Services shall consider any student 77
108108 enrolled in an institution of higher education in the state to be 78
109109 participating in a state or federally financed work-study program if such 79
110110 student receives approval of work-study as part of a financial aid 80
111111 package to attend such institution of higher education, regardless of 81
112112 whether such student has received his or her work-study program 82
113113 assignment. 83 Substitute Bill No. 6229
114114
115115
116116 LCO {\\PRDFS1\HCOUSERS\BARRYJN\WS\2021HB-06229-
117-R03-HB.docx }
117+R02-HB.docx }
118118 4 of 4
119119
120120 Sec. 4. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) Each public institution of higher 84
121121 education shall notify any student identified by the financial aid office 85
122122 of such public institution of higher education as potentially eligible for 86
123123 the supplemental nutrition assistance program pursuant to the federal 87
124124 Food and Nutrition Act of 2008, as amended from time to time, 88
125125 regarding (1) the qualification requirements for such program, (2) the 89
126126 application procedure for such program, and (3) where to obtain 90
127127 assistance in completing an application for such program.91
128128 This act shall take effect as follows and shall amend the following
129129 sections:
130130
131131 Section 1 July 1, 2021 New section
132132 Sec. 2 July 1, 2021 17b-105f
133133 Sec. 3 July 1, 2021 New section
134134 Sec. 4 July 1, 2021 New section
135135
136136 HED Joint Favorable Subst.
137-HS Joint Favorable
138137