House
|
06/28/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2021
|
Public Act 21-76
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
File Number 770
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 530
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 9536
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
House Reconsidered and Retained
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
File Number 501
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
House Calendar Number 368
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/21 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/19
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|