Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06444 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 1, 2021
Fiscal Note May 28, 2021
Fiscal Note May 27, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis October 12, 2021
Analysis June 1, 2021
Analysis May 28, 2021
Bill April 19, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 15, 2021