House
|
06/28/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2021
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Public Act 21-87
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2021
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2021
|
Senate Calendar Number 471
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
House Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
File Number 241
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
House Calendar Number 202
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2021
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/31/21 5:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|