Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06492 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/16/2021

                             
 
 
House Bill No. 6492 
 
Public Act No. 21-87 
 
 
AN ACT CONCERNING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN 
EXERTIONAL HEAT ILLNESS FOR COACHES, PARENTS, 
GUARDIANS AND STUDENTS. 
Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives in General 
Assembly convened: 
 
Section 1. (NEW) (Effective July 1, 2021) (a) As used in this section: 
(1) "Exertional heat illness" means an illness resulting from engaging 
in physical activity in the heat, including, but not limited to, heat 
cramps, heat syncope, heat exhaustion and heat stroke; 
(2) "Heat cramps" means sudden or progressively and noticeably 
evolving, involuntary, painful contractions of skeletal muscle during or 
after engaging in physical activity in the heat; 
(3) "Heat exhaustion" means the inability to effectively engage in 
physical activity in the heat, secondary to a combination of factors, 
including, but not limited to, cardiovascular insufficiency, hypotension, 
energy depletion and central fatigue and is manifested by an elevated 
core body temperature and associated with a high rate or volume of skin 
blood flow, heavy sweating and dehydration; 
(4) "Heat stroke" means a medical emergency characterized by 
neuropsychiatric impairment and a high core body temperature,  House Bill No. 6492 
 
Public Act No. 21-87 	2 of 4 
 
typically 105.8° Fahrenheit or above; 
(5) "Heat syncope" means sudden dizziness, feeling faint and fainting 
experienced after engaging in physical activity in the heat; and 
(6) "Intramural or interscholastic athletics" shall include any activity 
sponsored by a school or local education agency, as defined in section 
10-15f of the general statutes, or an organization sanctioned by the local 
education agency that involves any athletic contest, practice, 
scrimmage, competition, demonstration, display or club activity. 
(b) For the school year commencing July 1, 2022, and each school year 
thereafter, any person who holds or is issued a coaching permit by the 
State Board of Education and is a coach of intramural or interscholastic 
athletics shall complete an exertional heat illness awareness education 
program prior to commencing the coaching assignment for the season 
of such intramural or interscholastic athletics. Such program shall be 
developed or approved pursuant to subsection (c) of this section. For the 
school year commencing July 1, 2022, and each school year thereafter, 
any person who holds or is issued a coaching permit by the State Board 
of Education and is a coach of intramural or interscholastic athletics 
shall annually review the program developed or approved pursuant to 
subsection (c) of this section, prior to commencing the coaching 
assignment for the season of such intramural or interscholastic athletics. 
(c) On or before January 1, 2022, the governing authority for 
intramural and interscholastic athletics, in consultation with an 
appropriate organization representing licensed athletic trainers, an 
organization representing sports medical doctors, an organization that 
researches best practices in managing heat illness, and an organization 
representing county medical associations, shall develop or approve an 
exertional heat illness awareness education program for use by local and 
regional boards of education. Such program shall be published on the 
State Board of Education's Internet web site and shall include, but need  House Bill No. 6492 
 
Public Act No. 21-87 	3 of 4 
 
not be limited to, (1) the recognition of the symptoms of an exertional 
heat illness, (2) the means of obtaining proper medical treatment for a 
person suspected of having an exertional heat illness, and (3) the nature 
and risk of exertional heat illness, including the danger of continuing to 
engage in athletic activity after sustaining exertional heat illness and the 
proper method of allowing a student athlete who has sustained 
exertional heat illness to return to athletic activity. 
(d) On or before October 1, 2022, and annually thereafter, the 
governing authority for intramural and interscholastic athletics, in 
consultation with an appropriate organization representing licensed 
athletic trainers, an organization representing sports medical doctors, 
an organization that researches best practices in managing heat illness 
and an organization representing county medical associations, shall 
develop or approve annual review materials regarding current and 
relevant information regarding exertional heat illness for use by local 
and regional boards of education. 
(e) On or before January 1, 2022, the governing authority for 
intramural and interscholastic athletics, in consultation with an 
appropriate organization representing licensed athletic trainers, an 
organization representing sports medical doctors, an organization that 
researches best practices in managing heat illness and an organization 
representing county medical associations, shall develop a model 
exertional heat illness awareness plan for use by local and regional 
boards of education. Each local and regional board of education shall 
implement such plan by utilizing written materials, online training or 
videos or in-person training that shall address, at a minimum: (1) The 
recognition of signs or symptoms of exertional heat illness, (2) the means 
of obtaining proper medical treatment for a person suspected of an 
exertional heat illness, (3) the nature and risks of exertional heat illness, 
including the danger of continuing to engage in athletic activity after 
experiencing exertional heat illness, (4) the proper procedures for  House Bill No. 6492 
 
Public Act No. 21-87 	4 of 4 
 
allowing a student athlete who has experienced exertional heat illness 
to return to athletic activity, and (5) best practices in the prevention and 
treatment of exertional heat illness. 
(f) For the school year commencing July 1, 2022, and each school year 
thereafter, each local and regional board of education shall prohibit a 
student athlete from participating in any intramural or interscholastic 
activity unless the student athlete, and a parent or guardian of such 
student athlete, (1) reads written materials, (2) views online training or 
videos, or (3) attends in-person training developed or approved 
pursuant to this section. Acknowledgment of adherence to this standard 
by the student athlete and the parent or guardian shall be made by the 
parent's or guardian's signature on an athletic participation informed 
consent form issued by the applicable local or regional board of 
education. 
(g) The State Board of Education may revoke the coaching permit, in 
accordance with the provisions of subsection (i) of section 10-145b of the 
general statutes, of any coach found to be in violation of this section.