Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut House Bill HB06492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 1, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis July 29, 2021
Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 1, 2021
Analysis April 1, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 16, 2021