LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB06680
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut House Bill HB06680
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2021 Regular Session
Connecticut House Bill HB06680
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 7, 2021
Fiscal Note
June 4, 2021
Fiscal Note
June 1, 2021
Bill
May 6, 2021
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
June 28, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
June 7, 2021
Bill
June 1, 2021
Compare
Analysis
June 1, 2021