Connecticut 2021 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00954 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 29, 2021
Fiscal Note April 28, 2021
Fiscal Note April 22, 2021
Fiscal Note April 18, 2021
Fiscal Note April 12, 2021
Fiscal Note March 29, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis September 2, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis March 29, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Chaptered

Bill June 25, 2021