House | 06/02/2023 | House Calendar Number 628 | ||
House | 06/02/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/31/2023 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8188 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | File Number 116 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Senate Calendar Number 102 | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Joint Favorable Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/17/2023 | Public Hearing 02/21 | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |