Connecticut 2023 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB01059 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 31, 2023
Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis June 1, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023