LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB00324
Draft Versions
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00324
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2024 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB00324
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 3, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 30, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 17, 2024
Bill
February 28, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
July 2, 2024
Analysis
May 4, 2024
Bill
April 17, 2024
Compare
Analysis
April 17, 2024
Chaptered
Bill
May 20, 2024
Compare