House | 06/05/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor | ||
House | 05/29/2024 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | ||
House | 05/20/2024 | Special Act 24-23 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | In Concurrence | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Rules Suspended | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5782 | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Senate Reconsidered | ||
Senate | 05/08/2024 | Senate Passed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | File Number 580 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Senate Calendar Number 359 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | ||
Senate | 04/10/2024 | Joint Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Public Hearing 04/09 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |