Connecticut 2024 Regular Session

Connecticut Senate Bill SB00459 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 15, 2024
Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note April 22, 2024
Bill April 2, 2024

Chaptered

Bill May 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2024
Analysis April 22, 2024