House
|
03/08/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 350
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|