Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0269 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 24, 2021