|
05/26/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-135
|
|
|
|
05/25/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1536
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable with CS by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
PCS added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|