Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0389 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 21, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis May 26, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022