Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 114, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred to Higher Education Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Reported out of Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Added to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/16/2021
|
Now in Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/16/2021
|
Referred to Post-Secondary Education & Lifelong Learning Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|