Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0823 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022