Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1239 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2022
Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022