Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 102, NAYS 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/17/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
08/24/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|