Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H6011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022