|
05/10/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-37
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/08/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 30 NAYS 7
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/24/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 79, NAYS 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/16/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee (Amended)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|