Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0477 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023