House
|
04/18/2023
|
Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 942 (Ch. 2023-253)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Substituted SB 942
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/18/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Reported out of Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Added to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Now in Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|