Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0941 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis June 19, 2023
Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis March 31, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023