|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-72
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Substituted for CS/SB 1606
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable with CS by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
PCS added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|