Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis May 10, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 7, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 28, 2023