House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Reported out of Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Favorable by Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/08/2023
|
Added to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Now in Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2023
|
Referred to Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|