Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0081 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2024
Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis November 15, 2023
Analysis November 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill January 24, 2024