This docum ent does not reflect the intent or official position of the bill sponsor or House of Representatives. STORAGE NAME: h0081a.ECC DATE: 11/15/2023 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES STAFF ANALYSIS BILL #: HB 81 Civil Penalties Under The Gas Safety Law of 1967 SPONSOR(S): Brackett TIED BILLS: IDEN./SIM. BILLS: SB 366 REFERENCE ACTION ANALYST STAFF DIRECTOR or BUDGET/POLICY CHIEF 1) Energy, Communications & Cybersecurity Subcommittee 16 Y, 0 N Phelps Keating 2) Commerce Committee SUMMARY ANALYSIS The Gas Safety Law of 1967 (Gas Safety Law) authorizes the Public Service Commission (PSC) to regulate the safe transmission and distribution of natural gas in Florida. The PSC has the power to perform any and all acts necessary or appropriate to enforce compliance with the Gas Safety Law, which includes imposing maximum civil penalties. The current maximum civil penalties are $25,000 for each violation of the Gas Safety Law and $500,000 for any related series of violations. The federal counterpart to Florida’s Gas Safety Law, the Pipeline Safety Act, authorizes the U.S. Department of Transportation/Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration (PHMSA) to implement federal pipeline safety standards for interstate and intrastate gas pipelines. PHMSA’s current maximum civil penalty amounts are $257,664 for each pipeline safety violation and $2,576,627 for any related series of violations. The Pipeline Safety Act allows states to assume authority over intrastate gas pipelines subject to annual certifications with PHMSA. The PSC is currently the state agency certified by PHMSA to exercise this authority. However, the PSC received a letter this year stating that its certification is at risk due to Florida’s lower civil penalties compared to those of PHMSA, which may reduce the PSC’s enforcement capabilities. The bill increases the maximum monetary penalties for violations of the Gas Safety Law to mirror those currently used by PHMSA. The maximum daily penalty is increased from $25,000 to $257,664. The maximum aggregate penalty cap is increased from $500,000 to $2,576,627 for any related series of violations. The bill does not impose any compliance costs but may increase costs on private sector and local government entities that commit violations. The bill provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. STORAGE NAME: h0081a.ECC PAGE: 2 DATE: 11/15/2023 FULL ANALYSIS I. SUBSTANTIVE ANALYSIS A. EFFECT OF PROPOSED CHANGES: Present Situation Federal Law The U.S. Department of Transportation/Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration (PHMSA) implements federal pipeline safety standards for interstate and intrastate gas pipelines, hazardous liquid pipelines, and underground natural gas storage under the Pipeline Safety Act. 1 The Pipeline Safety Act authorizes state assumption of the intrastate regulatory, inspection, and enforcement responsibilities subject to an annual certification with PHMSA. 2 State agencies must adopt standards that comply with the Pipeline Safety Act to qualify for certification. 3 A state agency that does not satisfy the criteria for certification may enter into an agreement with PHMSA to undertake certain aspects of the natural gas safety programs for intrastate facilities on behalf of PHMSA. 4 The state agency under such an agreement would conduct safety inspections and identify violations, and PHMSA would enforce those violations. 5 PHMSA may enforce these violations by issuing warnings, compliance orders, and civil penalties. 6 Federal agencies are required to adjust minimum and maximum civil penalty amounts based upon inflationary measures to preserve the penalty’s deterrent impact. 7 As a result, in 2023 PHMSA increased the maximum penalty for daily violations of the Pipeline Safety Act to $257,664 and the total maximum penalty for any related series of violations to $2,576,627. 8 Florida Law The Gas Safety Law authorizes the Public Service Commission (PSC) to regulate the safe transmission and distribution of natural gas in Florida. 9 The Gas Safety Law grants the PSC exclusive jurisdiction over “all persons, corporations, partnerships, associations, public agencies, municipalities, or other legal entities engaged in the operation of gas transmission or distribution facilities with respect to their compliance with the rules and regulations governing safety standards.” 10 The PSC has rulemaking authority to implement the Gas Safety Law 11 and promulgates rules covering the design, improvement, fabrication, installation, inspection, repair, reporting, testing, and safety standards of gas transmission and gas distribution systems. 12 The PSC is currently the state agency certified by PHMSA to inspect and enforce intrastate gas pipelines. 13 1 See 49 U.S.C. §§ 60102-60143. 2 49 U.S.C. §§ 60105(e), 60106(d). 3 49 U.S.C. § 60105(b). 4 49 U.S.C. § 60106(d). 5 Id. 6 See 49 C.F.R §§ 190.201-190.243 (2023). 7 Federal Civil Penalties Inflation Adjustment Act Improvements Act of 2015. Pub. L. 114-74, 129 Stat. 599, 114th Congress, (Nov. 2, 2015). 8 49 C.F.R § 190.223(a) (2023). 9 S. 368.01-061, F.S. 10 S. 368.05(1), F.S.; see also S. 368.021, F.S. (providing more entities subject to PSC jurisdiction). 11 S. 368.03, F.S.; S. 368.05(2), F.S. 12 See ch. 25-12, F.A.C. 13 Florida Public Service Commission, Agency Analysis of 2023 House Bill 81, p. 2 (October 26, 2023). STORAGE NAME: h0081a.ECC PAGE: 3 DATE: 11/15/2023 The PSC has the power to perform any and all acts necessary or appropriate to enforce compliance with the Gas Safety Law and the Pipeline Safety Act, 14 including imposing civil penalties for noncompliance. 15 Any person who violates the Gas Safety Law is subject to a maximum daily penalty of $25,000 for each violation. 16 The total maximum penalty for any related series of violations is $500,000. 17 PHMSA’s Annual Certification of PSC PHMSA conducts annual “Progress Reports” to determine whether a state complies with the Pipeline Safety Act and qualifies for certification and grant funds. 18 The Progress Report assigns points to different areas of compliance, including civil penalty thresholds. 19 The PSC received a four-point deduction on its 2022 Progress Report due to Florida’s lower civil penalty amounts compared to those of PHMSA. 20 The continued loss of points may result in a reduced certification that removes the PSC’s enforcement capabilities. 21 Effect of Bill The bill increases the maximum monetary penalties for any violation of the Gas Safety Law by mirroring those currently used by PHMSA. The maximum daily penalty is increased from $25,000 to $257,664. The maximum aggregate penalty cap is increased from $500,000 to $2,576,627 for any related series of violations. The bill provides that the new penalties will take effect July 1, 2024. The bill may assist the state in maintaining its certification by PHMSA to enforce the Pipeline Safety Act and the Gas Safety Law. B. SECTION DIRECTORY: Section 1: Amends s. 368.061, F.S., relating to penalties for violations of the Gas Safety Law. Section 2: Provides an effective date of July 1, 2024. II. FISCAL ANALYSIS & ECONOMIC IMPACT STATEMENT A. FISCAL IMPACT ON STATE GOVERNMENT: 1. Revenues: None. 2. Expenditures: None. B. FISCAL IMPACT ON LOCAL GOVERNMENTS: 1. Revenues: 14 S. 368.05(2), F.S. (stating that the PSC may require repairs and improvements 15 S. 368.061(1), F.S. 16 Id. 17 Id. 18 Email from Zach Barrett of the U.S. Dep’t of Transportation to Andrew Giles Fay, Chairman of the Florida PSC (May 23, 2023), at 1. 19 Id. at 2; see also 49 U.S.C. § 60105(b)(7) (stating that States have discretion to enforce civil penalties substantially the same as those provided by PHMSA). 20 Id. 21 Id. STORAGE NAME: h0081a.ECC PAGE: 4 DATE: 11/15/2023 None. 2. Expenditures: None. C. DIRECT ECONOMIC IMPACT ON PRIVATE SECTOR: The bill does not impose additional compliance costs. However, the bill may impact private sector entities if the PSC assesses penalties on such entities above the current statutory limit. D. FISCAL COMMENTS: The bill does not impose additional compliance costs on local governments. However, the bill may increase fiscal impacts on local government-owned entities subject to PSC jurisdiction if the PSC assesses penalties on such entities above the current statutory limit. III. COMMENTS A. CONSTITUTIONAL ISSUES: 1. Applicability of Municipality/County Mandates Provision: Not applicable. The bill does not appear to affect county or municipal governments. 2. Other: None. B. RULE-MAKING AUTHORITY: The bill does not require or authorize rulemaking. C. DRAFTING ISSUES OR OTHER COMMENTS: PHMSA is required to increase the maximum civil penalties based upon inflationary measures, and may be required to increase the penalty amounts in the future. This may require subsequent amendments to the civil penalties in Florida’s Gas Safety Law. IV. AMENDMENTS/COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE CHANGES Not applicable.