House
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/29/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/30/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|