LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0631
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0631
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0631
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
November 21, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 30, 2024
Analysis
March 27, 2024
Analysis
February 15, 2024
Analysis
February 13, 2024
Analysis
February 6, 2024
Analysis
February 5, 2024
Analysis
January 29, 2024
Analysis
January 28, 2024