|
04/03/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-52
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 208
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Amendment 227167 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Added to Criminal Justice Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|