Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0801 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 4, 2024
Analysis March 14, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2024