House | 03/04/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Reported out of Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Favorable by Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Reported out of Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Favorable by Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Added to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Now in Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Referred to Postsecondary Education & Workforce Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Filed |