Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1137 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024