|
05/30/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-217
|
|
|
|
05/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 172
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Withdrawn from Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Original reference removed: Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Reported out of Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
PCS added to Ways & Means Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Local Administration, Federal Affairs & Special Districts Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Ways & Means Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|