Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2024
Analysis March 20, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2024