House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported out of PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Original reference removed: Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported out of Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
PCS added to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Now in Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Referred to Children, Families & Seniors Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|