Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1169 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 14, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024