|
04/19/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-104
|
|
|
|
04/18/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/16/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Amendment 668628 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (668628)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Fiscal Policy (231634); YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Referred to Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/21/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported out of Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Favorable with CS by Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Added to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Choice & Innovation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|