Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2024
Analysis March 26, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2024