House
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2024
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Reported out of Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Favorable by Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Added to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Now in Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2024
|
Referred to Constitutional Rights, Rule of Law & Government Operations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|