Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H1679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Analysis

Analysis April 16, 2024
Analysis March 25, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 19, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 1, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024