House | 03/04/2024 | Laid on Table | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added to Second Reading Calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Bill released to House Calendar | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Reported out of State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Favorable by State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Added to State Affairs Committee agenda | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Now in State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Favorable by Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Now in Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Referred to Regulatory Reform & Economic Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Filed |