LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
H7045
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H7045
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H7045
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 18, 2024
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
April 16, 2024
Analysis
March 15, 2024
Analysis
February 7, 2024
Analysis
February 5, 2024
Analysis
February 2, 2024
Analysis
January 30, 2024